VA HB364 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0144)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0144)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Execution of temporary detention orders; inmates in local correctional facilities. Authorizes deputy sheriffs and jail officers employed by a local correctional facility to execute temporary detention orders issued for inmates of the facility.
Title
Execution of temporary detention orders; inmates in local correctional facilities.
Sponsors
Del. Larry Rush [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0144) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 144 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018 | |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB364ER) |
2018-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-02 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2018-02-01 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-29 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103492D |