VA HB366 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Tourism Authority; Blue Ridge Highlands region. Requires the Virginia Tourism Authority to designate the Blue Ridge Highlands region to enhance tourism development efforts.
Title
Virginia Tourism Authority; designating Blue Ridge Highlands region to enhance tourism development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in General Laws |
2014-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-02-03 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101639D |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB366 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB366+hil |