VA HB366 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Failed to pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Restoration of firearms rights; report to State Police. Provides a mechanism for reporting to the Department of State Police when a circuit court restores a felon's right to possess, transport, and carry a firearm, ammunition for a firearm, or a stun weapon. The bill provides that if a court enters an order restoring a felon's right, the order shall contain the felon's name and date of birth and the clerk of the court shall certify and forward the restoration order to the Central Criminal Records Exchange (CCRE). The bill provides that the Department of State Police, upon receipt of the restoration order, shall enter the felon's name and description in the CCRE so that law-enforcement personnel accessing the CCRE will be aware of the order's existence. The bill has a delayed effective date of July 1, 2019.
Title
Felons; restoration of firearms rights, report to State Police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Failed to pass |
2018-03-10 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendments (16-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-13 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 18103753D-E |
2018-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB366E |
2018-02-12 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2018-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-10 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment (21-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-26 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103753D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |