VA HB366 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0348)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0348)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public defender offices; Cities of Manassas and Manassas Park and County of Prince William. Establishes a public defender office for the Cities of Manassas and Manassas Park and the County of Prince William.
Title
Public defender offices; Cities of Manassas and Manassas Park and County of Prince William.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Del. Hala Ayala [D] | Del. Lee Carter [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] |
Del. Dan Helmer [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Sen. Suhas Subramanyam [D] | Del. Luke Torian [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (33-Y 3-N) (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0348) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 348 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB366ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (33-Y 3-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (10-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2020-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2020-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102673D |
Same As/Similar To
SB72 (Same As) 2020-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0376)