VA HB366 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Assault and battery; penalties. Provides that a simple assault or an assault and battery committed against a judge, magistrate, law-enforcement officer, correctional officer, person directly involved in the care, treatment, or supervision of inmates, firefighter, or volunteer firefighter or emergency medical services personnel by a juvenile who has not been previously convicted of or proceeded against informally or adjudicated delinquent for an offense that would be a felony if committed by an adult is punishable as a Class 1 misdemeanor. Currently, any such offense is a punishable as a Class 6 felony, with a mandatory minimum term of confinement of six months. The bill also provides that any person charged with such offense who has been diagnosed by a psychiatrist or clinical psychologist with a mental illness, developmental disability, or intellectual disability and the violation was caused by or had a direct and substantial relationship to the person's mental illness or disability, then such person is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Assault and battery; penalties when committed against certain persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (6-Y 2-N) |
2022-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101630D |