VA HB366 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB366
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N)
Pending: Senate Finance and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Institutions of higher education; tuition grants; Virginia National Guard State Tuition Assistance Program. Makes several changes to the Virginia National Guard State Tuition Assistance Program, including (i) making the provisions relating to the requirements and conditions for eligibility for and award of grants under the Program subject to regulations as prescribed by the Adjutant General, (ii) eliminating the requirement to satisfy financial obligations with the institution of higher education at the beginning of each semester, (iii) simplifying the requirements relating to academic performance and good standing, and (iv) providing that upon acceptance, grant funds shall be disbursed to the applicable institution of higher education for credit against the recipient's student account. Institutions of higher education; tuition grants; Virginia National Guard State Tuition Assistance Program. Makes several changes to the Virginia National Guard State Tuition Assistance Program, including (i) making the provisions relating to the requirements and conditions for eligibility for and award of grants under the Program subject to regulations as prescribed by the Adjutant General, (ii) eliminating the requirement to satisfy financial obligations with the institution of higher education at the beginning of each semester, (iii) simplifying the requirements relating to academic performance and good standing, and (iv) providing that upon acceptance, grant funds shall be disbursed to the applicable institution of higher education for credit against the recipient's student account.
Title
Va. Nat'l Guard State Tuition Assistance Program; provisions relating to eligibility for grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-06 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Engrossed bill reprinted 24104415D-E |
2024-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 24104415D-E |
2024-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB366E |
2024-02-05 | House | Committee amendment from the Appropriations committee agreed to |
2024-02-05 | House | Committee amendment from the Education committee agreed to |
2024-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported from Education with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2024-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104415D |
Same As/Similar To
HB366 (Carry Over) 2024-02-27 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (13-Y 2-N)
SB219 (Similar To) 2024-01-31 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N)
SB219 (Similar To) 2024-01-31 - Continued to 2025 in Finance and Appropriations (10-Y 5-N)
Subjects
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Tuition
Virginia National Guard
Tuition
Virginia National Guard