VA HB379 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Left in Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electric utility customer account information; warrant required. Provides that an electric utility shall not disclose any customer account information absent a search warrant or the customer's consent. The electric utility may still release customer account information in statistical or aggregate form, provided that no particular customer can be identified.
Title
Electric utility; customer account information, warrant required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | House | Left in Commerce and Labor |
2016-02-11 | House | Continued to 2017 in Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2017 by voice vote |
2016-01-19 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Special Subcommittee on Energy |
2016-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2016-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100732D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB379 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB379+hil |