VA HB39 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Court reporters; indigent persons in a civil case. Provides that in a civil case in which a litigant is a person deemed indigent the court shall not require use of a court reporter.
Title
Court reporters; indigent persons in a civil case.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2016-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law |
2015-11-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2015-11-23 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100513D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB39 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB39+hil |