VA HB390 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Sand replenishment. Provides that when sand or other material is placed on state-owned bottomlands seaward of the mean low-water mark in order to provide beach nourishment or storm protection or as a result of a dredging project, the deposited material shall be deemed accretion. The public has a right of use and maintenance of the area as previously existed on the adjacent land above the mean low-water mark. The bill affects sand placement projects of the specified type beginning January 1, 2009.
Title
Sand replenishment; sand or other material placed on bottomlands to provide for beach nourishment.
Sponsors
Del. Christopher Stolle [R] | Del. Barry Knight [R] | Del. Ron Villanueva [R] | Sen. Bill DeSteph [R] |
Del. Scott Taylor [R] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234) | |
2014-03-17 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 234 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB390ER) |
2014-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB390ER) |
2014-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-02-21 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-02-20 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-20 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-01-20 | House | Read third time and passed House (95-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2014-01-17 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-16 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-15 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100708D |
Same As/Similar To
SB209 (Same As) 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0106)