VA HB398 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-04-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664)
Summary
Certificate of public need; relocation of nursing home beds. Exempts from the definition of "project" any relocation of up to 10 beds or 10% of beds, whichever is less, (i) from one existing facility to another existing facility at the same site in any two-year period or (ii) in any three year period, from one existing nursing home facility to any other existing nursing home facility owned by the same person that is located either within the same planning district, or within another planning district out of which, during that three-year period, at least 10 times that number of beds have been transferred and at least half of those beds have not been replaced.
Title
Certificate of public need; relocation of nursing home beds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-04-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664) | |
2008-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 664 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-09 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-03-07 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB398ER) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (93-Y 0-N 2-A) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (93-Y 0-N 2-A) | |
2008-03-05 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2008-03-04 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-03-03 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-29 | Senate: Passed by for the day | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-16 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-16 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-01-15 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB398H1 | |
2008-01-14 | House: Passed by for the day | |
2008-01-14 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 088543528-H1 | |
2008-01-14 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-11 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-11 | House: Committee substitute printed 088543528-H1 | |
2008-01-10 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086145528 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB398 |