VA HB398 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; bid, performance, and payment bonds; waiver by localities; sunset. Adds a sunset date of July 1, 2021, to the provisions (i) authorizing a locality, where the bid, performance, and payment bond requirements are waived, to waive the requirement for prequalification for a bidder or contractor with a current Class A contractor license for nontransportation-related construction contracts in excess of $100,000 but less than $300,000 upon a written determination made in advance by the local governing body that waiving the requirement is in the best interests of the locality and (ii) prohibiting localities from entering into more than 10 such contracts per year.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; bid, performance, and payment bonds, waiver by localities, sunset.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0462) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 462 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-14 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB398ER) |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-12 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102197D |