VA HB405 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commission on Electric Utility Regulation; evaluation of infrastructure necessary for electric vehicle charging facilities. Directs the State Corporation Commission and the Department of Housing and Community Development to provide technical assistance to the Commission on Electric Utility Regulation (the Commission) if the Commission evaluates the design and deployment of the electrical distribution infrastructure necessary to support the installation of electric vehicle charging facilities in new developments consisting of single-family and multifamily residential units. The bill requires the Commission to engage representatives from the residential and commercial development industries, private sector utility consultants, and other stakeholders if it conducts such an evaluation. Commission on Electric Utility Regulation; evaluation of infrastructure necessary for electric vehicle charging facilities. Directs the State Corporation Commission and the Department of Housing and Community Development to provide technical assistance to the Commission on Electric Utility Regulation (the Commission) if the Commission evaluates the design and deployment of the electrical distribution infrastructure necessary to support the installation of electric vehicle charging facilities in new developments consisting of single-family and multifamily residential units. The bill requires the Commission to engage representatives from the residential and commercial development industries, private sector utility consultants, and other stakeholders if it conducts such an evaluation.
Title
Electric vehicle charging facilities; infrastructure necessary to support installation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (66-Y 32-N) (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Local Government (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Local Government (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) (Y: 58 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 7-N) (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-04-08 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB405ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (66-Y 32-N) |
2024-03-07 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 24108904D-S1 (66-Y 32-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB405S1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Surovelll agreed to 24108904D-S1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 24108904D-S1 (Surovell) |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to General Laws and Technology |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred from Local Government (9-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (58-Y 41-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (58-Y 41-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB405H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24107557D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-08 | House | Incorporates HB567 (Askew) |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee substitute printed 24107557D-H1 |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (13-Y 7-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-04 | House | Assigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred from Counties, Cities and Towns by voice vote |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104948D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Counties Cities and Towns
Electric Vehicles
State Corporation Commission
Uncodified Legislation
Counties Cities and Towns
Electric Vehicles
State Corporation Commission
Uncodified Legislation