VA HB410 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Student-athletes; concussion policies. Requires each non-interscholastic youth sports program utilizing public school property to (i) establish policies and procedures regarding the identification and handling of suspected concussions in student-athletes, consistent with either the local school division's policies and procedures or the Board's Guidelines for Policies on Concussions in Student-Athletes, or (ii) follow the local school division's policies and procedures regarding the identification and handling of suspected concussions in student-athletes. The bill also adds information on the effects of concussions on academic performance to the Board's Guidelines for Policies on Concussions in Student-Athletes.
Title
Student-athletes; effects of concussions on academic performance.
Sponsors
Del. Timothy Hugo [R] | Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Richard Anderson [R] |
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Roxann Robinson [R] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) (Y: 0 N: 98 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 98 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0760) | |
2014-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 760 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB410ER) |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-27 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-26 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2014-02-26 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-18 | House | Delegates: Anderson, Bell, R.P., Kory |
2014-02-18 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senators: Stuart, Edwards, Barker |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2014-02-17 | House | House acceded to request |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendments (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 96-N) |
2014-02-12 | House | Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 96-N) |
2014-02-11 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-23 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 2-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB410H1 |
2014-01-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 14103959D-H1 |
2014-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-20 | House | Committee substitute printed 14103959D-H1 |
2014-01-20 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (20-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Reform |
2014-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2014-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101490D |
Same As/Similar To
SB172 (Same As) 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0746)