VA HB429 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-28 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-28 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N)
Summary
Forced or coerced abortion prohibited; penalty. Provides that any person who forces or coerces a pregnant female of any age to have an abortion against her will is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor. However, if such a violation is committed when the pregnant female is less than 18 years of age, the person is guilty of a Class 6 felony.
Title
Abortion; forced or coerced prohibited, penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-28 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (10-Y 5-N) | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-02-13 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-12 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-12 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (64-Y 35-N) | |
2008-02-12 | House: Read third time and passed House (64-Y 35-N) | |
2008-02-11 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB429H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 080524616-H1 | |
2008-02-11 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-08 | House: Reported from Appropriations (17-Y 7-N) | |
2008-02-05 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety (Sherwood) | |
2008-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 080524616-H1 | |
2008-02-01 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 4-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080558616 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB429 |