VA HB429 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-16 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Animal welfare; disposition of animals in county or city pounds. Prohibits city or county pounds from euthanizing, or prohibiting the adoption of, any dog based solely on breed.
Title
Animal welfare; prohibits city or county from euthanizing or adoption of any dog solely on breed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-16 | House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote | |
2010-01-25 | House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 5-N) | |
2010-01-20 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: #1 Agriculture | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102060D |