VA HB429 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Human Rights Act; public employment; prohibited discrimination; sexual orientation. Prohibits discrimination in employment on the basis of sexual orientation. The bill defines "sexual orientation" as a person's actual or perceived heterosexuality, bisexuality, homosexuality, or gender identity or expression. The bill expressly provides that "sexual orientation" does not include any person's attraction toward persons with whom sexual conduct would be illegal due to the age of the parties. The bill also codifies existing prohibited discrimination in public employment on the basis of race, color, religion, national origin, sex, pregnancy, childbirth or related medical conditions, age, marital status, disability, or status as a veteran. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Virginia Human Rights Act; public employment, prohibited discrimination.
Sponsors
Del. Ron Villanueva [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Steve Heretick [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Mark Sickles [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Del. Joseph Yost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in General Laws |
2016-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-02-03 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2016-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102590D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1500.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1507 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 1604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3900 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3903 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 295.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB429 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB429+hil |