VA HB432 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Making copy of jury panel available to counsel. Increases from three to five full business days before a trial the timeframe within which the clerk or sheriff or other officer responsible for notifying jurors to appear in court for the trial of a case must make available to all counsel of record a copy of the jury panel to be used for the trial of such case. Making copy of jury panel available to counsel. Increases from three to five full business days before a trial the timeframe within which the clerk or sheriff or other officer responsible for notifying jurors to appear in court for the trial of a case must make available to all counsel of record a copy of the jury panel to be used for the trial of such case.
Title
Jurors; availability of copy of jury panel to counsel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0040) | |
2024-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 40 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2024 |
2024-02-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB432ER) |
2024-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Printed as engrossed 24101633D-E |
2024-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB432E |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2024-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2024-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101633D |