VA HB445 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
School principals; incident reports. Eliminates the requirement that school principals report certain enumerated acts that may constitute a misdemeanor offense to law enforcement.
Title
School principals; incident reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102544D |