VA HB453 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Kinship foster care; barrier crimes. Allows local boards of social services or child-placing agencies to approve kinship foster care parent applicants who have been convicted of certain felony drug offenses if five years have elapsed since the date of the conviction, where under current law 10 years must have elapsed in order to be eligible for approval as a kinship foster care parent. The bill also adds exceptions for certain misdemeanor assault and battery convictions not involving a minor if five years have elapsed since the date of the conviction. The bill directs the State Board of Social Services to adopt regulations to implement the provisions of the bill to be effective no later than September 1, 2024. Kinship foster care; barrier crimes. Allows local boards of social services or child-placing agencies to approve kinship foster care parent applicants who have been convicted of certain felony drug offenses if five years have elapsed since the date of the conviction, where under current law 10 years must have elapsed in order to be eligible for approval as a kinship foster care parent. The bill also adds exceptions for certain misdemeanor assault and battery convictions not involving a minor if five years have elapsed since the date of the conviction. The bill directs the State Board of Social Services to adopt regulations to implement the provisions of the bill to be effective no later than September 1, 2024.
Title
Kinship foster care; barrier crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (11-Y 1-N 3-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 5-N) (Y: 34 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (11-Y 1-N 3-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House: Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0529) | |
2024-04-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 529 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-06 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB453ER) |
2024-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-29 | House | VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-29 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (34-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (11-Y 1-N 3-A) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-12 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from Health and Human Services (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned sub: Social Services |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104807D |