VA HB466 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Environmental permit conditions. Prohibits the State Air Pollution Control Board, the State Water Control Board, and the Virginia Waste Management Board from reviewing or amending a permit or certificate solely on the basis of the proximity of the permitted operation to a public greenway, defined in the bill as any system of hiking, biking, or horseback trails established by a locality or other political subdivision.
Title
Environmental permits; issuance to businesses near greenways.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Head [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Chesapeake |
2016-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2016-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102965D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB466 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB466+hil |