VA HB479 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066)
Summary
Emergency Medical Services Plan; Stroke Triage Plan. Requires the Board of Health to develop and maintain as a component of the Emergency Medical Services Plan a statewide prehospital and interhospital Stroke Triage Plan designed to promote rapid access for stroke patients to appropriate, organized stroke care. The Plan shall include formal regional stroke triage plans, which shall be reviewed triennially. This bill is identical to
Title
Stroke Triage Plan; Board of Health to develop and maintain as component of EMS Plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0066) | |
2008-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 66 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-20 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-19 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB479ER) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-21 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-18 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-18 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Printed as engrossed 084042840-E | |
2008-01-17 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB479E | |
2008-01-17 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2008-01-17 | House: Read second time | |
2008-01-16 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-15 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084042840 |
Same As/Similar To
SB344 (Same As) 2010-02-15 - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB479 |