VA HB482 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Reports of certain arrests and convictions of school employees; timing; method. Requires any probation and parole officer who is supervising a person employed by a local school division in the Commonwealth, upon discovering that such supervised person has been arrested for or convicted of a felony offense or an equivalent offense in another state, to report such arrest or conviction to the Superintendent of Public Instruction and the designated division safety official in the local school division in which such supervised person is employed as soon as practicable but no later than 48 hours after such arrest. Current law requires such report to be made as soon as practicable. The bill also removes the requirement to report certain arrests and convictions of school employees enumerated in law via fax to the fax number identified for the division superintendent or the designated division safety official, as the case may be. However, the requirements in current law to make such reports via certified mail and email are preserved.
Title
School employees; reports of certain arrests and convictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Education |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-19 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 Subcommittee |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101307D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 2 | 291.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 299.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 83.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 279.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |