VA HB486 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Additional sales and use tax in Henry County, Northampton County, Patrick County, Pittsylvania County and the City of Danville; appropriations of Henry County, Northampton County, Patrick County, and Pittsylvania County to incorporated towns for educational purposes. Authorizes Henry County, Northampton County, Patrick County, Pittsylvania County, and the City of Danville to impose an additional local sales and use tax at a rate not to exceed one percent, as determined by the governing body, if initiated by a resolution of the local governing body and approved by the voters at a referendum. The bill requires the governing body to specify in the enacting ordinance the time period, not to exceed 20 years, for which the tax would be imposed. Revenue from the tax shall be used solely for capital projects for new construction or major renovation of schools in the locality enacting the tax.
Title
Henry, Northampton, Patrick, & Pittsylvania Counties & City of Danville; additional sales &use tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 7-N) (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 21-N) (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (79-Y 21-N) (Y: 79 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 327 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB486ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (14-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-11 | House | VOTE: Passage (79-Y 21-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read third time and passed House (79-Y 21-N) |
2020-02-11 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2020-02-10 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB486H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107422D-H1 |
2020-02-10 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-05 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (15-Y 7-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107422D-H1 |
2020-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100893D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 605 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 605.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
58 | 1 | 606.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |