VA HB488 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0069)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0069)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Golf carts and utility vehicles. Adds the Town of Clifton to the list of towns without their own police departments that may permit operation of golf carts and utility vehicles on their highways.
Title
Golf carts and utility vehicles; Town of Clifton allows on their highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0069) | |
2014-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 69 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB488ER) |
2014-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2014-01-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-14 | House | Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101069D |