VA HB500 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Practice of audiology; cerumen management. Adds limited cerumen management to the definition of the practice of audiology and requires the Board of Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology to promulgate regulations governing the practice of cerumen management, including requirements related to the training and qualifications of audiologists who perform cerumen management, within 280 days.
Title
Audiology; adds limited cerumen management to definition of practice.
Sponsors
Del. Joseph Yost [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-17 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0327) | |
2014-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 327 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB500ER) |
2014-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2014-01-17 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-17 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (93-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-16 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-14 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102385D |