VA HB513 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 7 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465)
Summary
Virginia State University Board of Visitors. Increases the Virginia State University Board of Visitors from 11 to 15 members, establishes the term of office of the four additional members, and makes technical and clarifying amendments. This bill is identical to
Title
Virginia State University; increases number of members of Board of Visitors
Sponsors
Del. Kirkland Cox [R] | Sen. Rosalyn Dance [D] | Del. Algie Howell [D] | Del. Riley Ingram [R] |
Sen. Jennifer McClellan [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] | Del. Onzlee Ware [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0465) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Enacted, Chapter 465 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-03-07 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2008-03-07 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2008-03-07 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB513ER2) | |
2008-03-07 | House: Reenrolled | |
2008-03-07 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2008-03-07 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (96-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-05 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 1-N) | |
2008-03-04 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2008-03-04 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-20 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-19 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB513ER) | |
2008-02-19 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-15 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-14 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2008-01-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-21 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-21 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (95-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-21 | House: Read third time and passed House (95-Y 1-N) | |
2008-01-18 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-17 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-16 | House: Reported from Education (19-Y 2-N) | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084183484 |
Same As/Similar To
SB389 (Same As) 2010-01-27 - Senate: Continued to 2011 in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB513 |