VA HB516 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Requires 67 afirmative votes to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Requires 67 afirmative votes to override Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; policy on sexually explicit instructional material. Requires the Board of Education to establish a policy to require each public elementary or secondary school to (i) notify the parent of any student whose teacher reasonably expects to provide instructional material that includes sexually explicit content, as defined by the Board; (ii) permit the parent of any student to review instructional material that includes sexually explicit content upon request; and (iii) provide, as an alternative to instructional material and related academic activities that include sexually explicit content, nonexplicit instructional material and related academic activities to any student whose parent so requests.
Title
Education, Board of; policy on sexually explicit instructional material.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (66-Y 34-N) (Y: 68 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (77-Y 21-N) (Y: 79 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 21-N) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (77-Y 21-N) (Y: 79 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 21-N) (Y: 78 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | House | Requires 67 afirmative votes to override Governor's veto |
2016-04-20 | House | VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (66-Y 34-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | House sustained Governor's veto (66-Y 34-N) |
2016-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-04-04 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2016-03-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/9/2016 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB516ER) |
2016-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (77-Y 21-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (77-Y 21-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House |
2016-03-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (76-Y 21-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (76-Y 21-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Pending question ordered |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (22-Y 17-N) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (9-Y 6-N) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2016-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-01 | House | Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Elementary and Secondary Education |
2016-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101171D |