VA HB53 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Actions against real estate appraisers or appraisal management companies; statute of limitations. Provides that no action for damages or other relief alleging that a certified general real estate appraiser, a certified residential real estate appraiser, a licensed residential real estate appraiser, or an appraisal management company committed malpractice or negligence or an error, mistake, omission, or breach in an appraisal or appraisal report, whether based on contract or tort, shall be brought unless it is filed in a court of competent jurisdiction and proper venue within five years from the date of the alleged malpractice, negligence, error, mistake, omission, or breach. The bill provides exceptions for actions alleging fraud and proceedings initiated by the Real Estate Appraiser Board. The bill provides that any action for damages or other relief alleging that a certified general real estate appraiser, a certified residential real estate appraiser, a licensed residential real estate appraiser, or an appraisal management company committed malpractice or negligence or an error, mistake, omission, or breach in an appraisal or appraisal report before July 1, 2024, shall be filed in a court of competent jurisdiction and proper venue within two years of the occurrence of such malpractice, negligence, error, mistake, omission, or breach, regardless of the date of discovery of such occurrence. Actions against real estate appraisers or appraisal management companies; statute of limitations. Provides that no action for damages or other relief alleging that a certified general real estate appraiser, a certified residential real estate appraiser, a licensed residential real estate appraiser, or an appraisal management company committed malpractice or negligence or an error, mistake, omission, or breach in an appraisal or appraisal report, whether based on contract or tort, shall be brought unless it is filed in a court of competent jurisdiction and proper venue within five years from the date of the alleged malpractice, negligence, error, mistake, omission, or breach. The bill provides exceptions for actions alleging fraud and proceedings initiated by the Real Estate Appraiser Board. The bill provides that any action for damages or other relief alleging that a certified general real estate appraiser, a certified residential real estate appraiser, a licensed residential real estate appraiser, or an appraisal management company committed malpractice or negligence or an error, mistake, omission, or breach in an appraisal or appraisal report before July 1, 2024, shall be filed in a court of competent jurisdiction and proper venue within two years of the occurrence of such malpractice, negligence, error, mistake, omission, or breach, regardless of the date of discovery of such occurrence.
Title
Actions against real estate appraisers or appraisal management companies; statute of limitations.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2024-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2024-01-15 | House | Assigned GL sub: Professions/Occupations and Administrative Process |
2023-12-22 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2023-12-22 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100658D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2019.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2024 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |