VA HB530 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Condominium and Property Owners' Association Acts; compliance with declaration. Clarifies that an action against the association for noncompliance with all lawful provisions of the Condominium and Property Owners' Association Acts and all provisions of the declaration is not precluded. The bill also authorizes the court to award attorney fees to the prevailing party.
Title
Condominium and Property Owners' Association Acts; compliance with declaration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0569) | |
2014-04-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 569 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB530ER) |
2014-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendments (13-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-29 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-28 | House | Printed as engrossed 14101313D-E |
2014-01-28 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB530E |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2014-01-28 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Reported from General Laws with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101313D |