VA HB536 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Summary
Compensation of court-appointed counsel; juvenile offenders. Provides that court-appointed counsel who are appointed to defend a juvenile in district court for an offense that would be a felony if committed by an adult may request a waiver on the compensation cap up to certain specified amounts depending on the charges being defended when the effort expended, the time reasonably necessary for the particular representation, the novelty and difficulty of the issues, or other circumstances warrant such a waiver. The maximum amounts of the waivers allowed are fixed at the level of the compensation cap for defending adults of the same crimes in circuit court.
Title
Court-appointed counsel; compensation in district court for those defending juvenile offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2008-02-05 | House: Assigned App. sub: General Government (Abbitt) | |
2008-02-01 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 081068676 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB536 |