VA HB536 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage. Increases the minimum wage from its current federally mandated level of $7.25 per hour to $8.25 per hour effective July 1, 2014, and to $9.25 per hour effective July 1, 2015, unless a higher minimum wage is required by the federal Fair Labor Standards Act.
Title
Minimum wage; increases wage from its current federally mandated level.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Tabled in Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2014-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2014-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100895D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB536 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB536+hil |