VA HB55 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on February 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; list maintenance; lists of decedents transmitted by State Registrar of Vital Records. Requires the State Registrar of Vital Records to transmit to the Department of Elections a weekly list of decedents from the previous week. Currently, this list is transmitted monthly. The bill requires the general registrars to use this information to conduct list maintenance and to promptly cancel the registration of a person on the list.
Title
Voter registration; list of decedent transmitted by St. Reg. of Vital Records to Dept. of Elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 5-N) (Y: 95 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 3-N) (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0004) | |
2022-02-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 4 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-02-17 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., February 24, 2022 | |
2022-02-17 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 17, 2022 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-16 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB55ER) |
2022-02-16 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Adoption (95-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 22106236D-S1 (95-Y 5-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB55S1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 22106236D-S1 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 22106236D-S1 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (12-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-01-27 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-27 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-26 | House | Printed as engrossed 22102595D-E |
2022-01-26 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB55E |
2022-01-26 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2022-01-26 | House | Read second time |
2022-01-25 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-21 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2022-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102595D |
Same As/Similar To
SB211 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0028)
SB211 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0028)
SB211 (Same As) 2022-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0028)