VA HB557 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0124)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0124)
Summary
Criminal procedure; provisions applicable to witnesses. Removes § 8.01-407.1 (Identity of persons communicating anonymously over the Internet) from the sweep-in provisions which make certain Code sections applicable to both civil and criminal case witnesses. The provisions of § 8.01-407.1 apply only to civil cases.
Title
Witnesses; provisions applicable to those in criminal as well as civil cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0124) | |
2008-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 124 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-21 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB557ER) | |
2008-02-21 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-28 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-01-25 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-01-25 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-25 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-01-23 | House: Read first time | |
2008-01-21 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086964760 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB557 |