VA HB557 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0088)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0088)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Opening of the school year. Provides that the requirement that the school calendar begin after Labor Day may be waived by the Board of Education, provided the school board certifies that it meets one of the good cause requirements in current law.
Title
School calendar; requirement that school begin after Labor Day may be waived by Board of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0088) | |
2010-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 88 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-02-24 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-02-24 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB557ER) | |
2010-02-24 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2010-01-29 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-01-28 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-01-26 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-25 | House: Reported from Education (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-21 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Education sub: #3 Teachers and Admin. Action | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100714D |
Same As/Similar To
SB253 (Same As) 2010-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0049)