VA HB559 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0557)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0557)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Compensation for wrongful incarceration for a felony conviction. Clarifies that individuals granted an absolute pardon by the Governor may be considered under the wrongful incarceration compensation statute. The bill also provides that the amount of compensation provided under the statute be adjusted for inflation. In addition, the bill specifies that any person awarded compensation who is subsequently incarcerated upon the revocation of parole or probation resulting from the commission of an act that constitutes a crime shall, during the period of such incarceration, forfeit any payments under an annuity purchased. Any forfeited amounts under the annuity shall become the property of the Commonwealth and shall be deposited into the general fund of the state treasury.
Title
Wrongful incarceration for felony conviction; individuals granted an absolute pardon.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Tata [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-13 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-03-10 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0557) | |
2010-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 557 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB559ER) | |
2010-03-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-13 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Conference report agreed to by House (94-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N) | |
2010-03-13 | House: Conference substitute printed 10106059D-H1 | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Senators: McEachin, Puller, Blevins | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Conferees appointed by Senate | |
2010-03-11 | House: Delegates: Tata, Albo, Toscano | |
2010-03-11 | House: Conferees appointed by House | |
2010-03-11 | House: House acceded to request | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Senate requested conference committee | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-11 | House: VOTE: --- REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) | |
2010-03-11 | House: Senate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 97-N) | |
2010-03-10 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Committee amendments agreed to | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Reading of amendments waived | |
2010-03-10 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-09 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Printed as engrossed 10103096D-E | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB559E | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Assigned Courts sub: #5 Constitutional Law | |
2010-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-21 | House: Referred from Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103096D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 01 | 195.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 195.11 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 195.12 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |