VA HB561 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Corporations and regulated business entities; not set out and obsolete sections of the Code of Virginia. Sets out sections in Title 13.1 (Corporations) and Title 56 (Public Service Companies) that are currently carried by reference only. The bill also repeals a section not set out in Title 13.1 (Corporations) that states the legislative intent of the chapter relating to professional corporations and is currently carried by reference only. The bill contains technical amendments. This bill is a recommendation of the Virginia Code Commission.
Title
Corporations and regulated business entities; not set out and obsolete sections of the Code.
Sponsors
Del. Don Scott [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0234) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 234 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB561ER) |
2022-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-25 | House | Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101109D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 1 | 1123 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
13 | 1 | 542 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2717 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |