VA HB564 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-13 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 130 (effective 7/1/10)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-13 - Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 130 (effective 7/1/10)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Norfolk/Virginia Beach light rail project. Provides that funds for the Norfolk/Virginia Beach light rail project will be expended in accordance with Federal Transit Administration requirements, notwithstanding any contrary provision of law.
Title
Norfolk/Virginia Beach light rail project; funds will be expended in accordance with FTA.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 130 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0130) | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-01 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-01 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB564ER) | |
2010-03-01 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Transportation (14-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-02-10 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-09 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2010-02-04 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-02 | House: Reported from Transportation (18-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-01 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-20 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #1 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103070D |