VA HB566 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-06 - House: Incorporated by Appropriations (HB923-Rust) by voice vote
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-06 - House: Incorporated by Appropriations (HB923-Rust) by voice vote
Summary
Literary Fund; distributions. Raises the maximum limit for any loan from the Literary Fund from $7.5 million to $14 million. This bill was incorporated into
Title
Literary Fund; distributions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-06 | House: Incorporated by Appropriations (HB923-Rust) by voice vote | |
2008-01-25 | House: Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education (Tata) | |
2008-01-21 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-21 | House: Referred from Education by voice vote | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Education | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 084504480 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB566 |