VA HB566 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public hospitals; medical debt collection practices. Public hospitals; medical debt collection practices. Requires the University of Virginia Medical Center (the Medical Center) and the Virginia Commonwealth University Health System Authority (the Authority) to make payment plans available to each person who incurs a debt related to medical treatment. The bill (i) requires that such payment plans be provided in writing and cap monthly payments at no more than five percent of the person's household income, (ii) provides that the first payment under such payment plan shall not be due until a date that is at least 90 days after the date on which treatment was provided or the date on which the person discharged, and (iii) provides that a person who has made at least 10 payments pursuant to the payment plan in a 12-month period shall be deemed to be in compliance with the payment plan. The bill also prohibits the Medical Center and the Authority from charging interest or late fees for medical debt, requires the Medical Center and Authority to make information available in writing in languages other than English spoken in the service area and via oral translation service for other languages, prohibits the Medical Center and the Authority from selling medical debt to any person other than an organization that purchases medical debt for the purpose of paying such debt in full, prohibits the Medical Center and the Authority from initiating any extraordinary debt collection action including garnishment of wages or liens on a debtor's primary residence or vehicle, and requires the Medical Center and the Authority to establish a Financial Assistance Ombudsman Office to assist patients and other persons with issues related to financial assistance, payment plans, and debt collection.
Title
Public hospitals; medical debt collection practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103701D |
Subjects
Hospitals and Hospitalization
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Institutions of Higher Education; Other Educational and Cultural Institutions
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 1 | 2213.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 2429 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |