VA HB569 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 14 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Employment discrimination; employee notification of federal and state statute of limitations. Requires an employer that employs 10 or more employees and that receives an employee complaint alleging sexual assault, harassment, or any other form of discrimination for which the employee may seek enforcement by the U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC) or the Office of the Attorney General to notify such employee that a charge may be filed with the EEOC or the Office of the Attorney General within 300 days after the alleged unlawful discriminatory practice occurred. The bill also requires an employer to provide this information as part of any new employee training provided at the commencement of employment or anti-discrimination training provided to an employee. Employment discrimination; employee notification of federal and state statute of limitations. Requires an employer that employs 10 or more employees and that receives an employee complaint alleging sexual assault, harassment, or any other form of discrimination for which the employee may seek enforcement by the U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission (EEOC) or the Office of the Attorney General to notify such employee that a charge may be filed with the EEOC or the Office of the Attorney General within 300 days after the alleged unlawful discriminatory practice occurred. The bill also requires an employer to provide this information as part of any new employee training provided at the commencement of employment or anti-discrimination training provided to an employee.
Title
Employment discrimination; employee notification of federal and state statute of limitations.
Sponsors
Del. Rozia Henson [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Laura Jane Cohen [D] |
Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Karen Keys-Gamarra [D] | Del. Marty Martinez [D] | Del. Irene Shin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (50-Y 46-N) (Y: 50 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (49-Y 48-N) (Y: 49 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (49-Y 48-N) (Y: 49 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-03-14 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB569ER) |
2024-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-26 | House | VOTE: Adoption (50-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-26 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 24107982D-S1 (50-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB569S1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24107982D-S1 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24107982D-S1 |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-05 | House | VOTE: Passage (49-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (49-Y 48-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Printed as engrossed 24102912D-E |
2024-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB569E |
2024-02-02 | House | Amendment by Delegate Henson agreed to |
2024-02-02 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2024-01-30 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24102912D |