VA HB570 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (9-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (9-Y 5-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Real property tax assessments; appeals. Changes the burden of proof from the taxpayer to the assessor when a taxpayer appeals the assessment of real property to a board of equalization or to a circuit court.
Title
Real property tax assessments; appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (9-Y 5-N) (Y: 9 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 88 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) (Y: 88 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Finance (9-Y 5-N) | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-04 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (86-Y 13-N) | |
2010-02-04 | House: Read third time and passed House (86-Y 13-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Printed as engrossed 10103914D-E | |
2010-02-03 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB570E | |
2010-02-03 | House: Amendments by Delegate Iaquinto agreed to | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-02 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-01 | House: Reported from Finance (19-Y 2-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-18 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103914D |