VA HB572 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1188)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1188)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Distributed renewable energy. Promotes the establishment of distributed renewable solar and other renewable energy. The measure (i) requires the State Corporation Commission to establish by regulation a shared solar program that allows multifamily customers of investor-owned utilities, other than American Electric Power, to purchase electric power through a subscription in a shared solar facility; (ii) raises the cap on the total amount of renewable energy that can be net metered in a utility's service territory from one percent to six percent, five percent of which is available to all customers and one percent of which is available only to low-income utility customers; (iii) raises the cap for net-metered nonresidential generation facilities from one megawatt to three megawatts; (iv) allows certain localities to install solar or wind facilities of up to five megawatts on government-owned property and use the electricity for government-owned buildings; (v) increases the cap on the capacity of generation from facilities from the customer's expected annual energy consumption to 150 percent of such amount for customers in Dominion Energy Virginia's service territory; (vi) prohibits standby charges for any residential customer-generator or agricultural customer-generator of an investor-owned utility other than Dominion Energy Virginia; and (vii) increases the cap on third party power purchase agreements to 500 megawatts for jurisdictional customers and 500 megawatts for nonjurisdictional customers of Dominion Energy Virginia and to 40 megawatts for customers of American Electric Power. The measure also amends the Commonwealth Energy Policy to include provisions supporting distributed generation of renewable energy.
Title
Distributed solar & other renewable energy; sales of electricity under third-party agreements.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] | Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Del. Nancy Guy [D] |
Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Sally Hudson [D] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] |
Del. Kathy Tran [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 15-N) (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (62-Y 35-N 1-A) (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (67-Y 31-N) (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (62-Y 35-N 1-A) (Y: 62 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (24-Y 15-N) (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) (Y: 0 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (67-Y 31-N) (Y: 67 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (16-Y 6-N) (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1188) | |
2020-04-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1188 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB572ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-08 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (23-Y 15-N) |
2020-03-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (62-Y 35-N 1-A) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (62-Y 35-N 1-A) |
2020-03-07 | House | Conference substitute printed 20109768D-H2 |
2020-03-07 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senators: McClellan, Spruill, Vogel |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Delegates: Keam, Lopez, Runion |
2020-03-05 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-03-04 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (24-Y 15-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 100-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20109047D-S1 (0-Y 100-N) |
2020-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 17-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB572S1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20109047D-S1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20109047D-S1 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (67-Y 31-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (67-Y 31-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB572H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20107625D-H1 |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Incorporates HB912 (Simon) |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107625D-H1 |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (16-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 2-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101906D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1184 (Same As) 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1189)
SB710 (Same As) 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1187)
HB1647 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1239)
SB710 (Same As) 2020-04-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1187)
HB1647 (Same As) 2020-04-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1239)