VA HB573 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Community solar development pilot program; low-income communities. Requires each incumbent electric utility to select for dedication to its community solar development pilot program one or more eligible generating facilities that are located within a low-income community as a condition for the utility's selection for dedication to its program any eligible generating facility that is located outside a low-income community. The bill requires the costs of the selected facilities in low-income communities to equal or exceed the costs of the eligible generating facility that is located outside a low-income community. These requirements apply to facilities selected on or after July 1, 2020. The bill defines a low-income community as a census tract that is designated in 2019 or thereafter as a qualified census tract for purposes of the Low-Income Housing Tax Credit. Such census tracts are required to have 50 percent of households with incomes below 60 percent of the area median gross income or have a poverty rate of 25 percent or more.
Title
Community solar development pilot program; low-income communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N 1-A) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N 1-A) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (19-Y 1-N) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663) | |
2020-04-06 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 663 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB573ER) |
2020-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (27-Y 13-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (25-Y 14-N 1-A) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-07 | House | VOTE: Passage (90-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce (19-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-01-15 | House | Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100585D |