VA HB586 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0141)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0141)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Training standards for law-enforcement officers; drug use. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to establish training standards and publish and periodically update model policies for law-enforcement personnel on the use of naloxone or other opioid antagonists to prevent opioid overdose deaths, in coordination with statewide naloxone training programs developed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services and the Virginia Department of Health. Training standards for law-enforcement officers; drug use. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services to establish training standards and publish and periodically update model policies for law-enforcement personnel on the use of naloxone or other opioid antagonists to prevent opioid overdose deaths, in coordination with statewide naloxone training programs developed by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Services and the Virginia Department of Health.
Title
Law-enforcement officers; training standards.
Sponsors
Del. Adele McClure [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Nadarius Clark [D] | Del. Rozia Henson [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Holly Seibold [D] | Del. Irene Shin [D] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N) (Y: 52 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0141) | |
2024-03-26 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 141 (effective 7/1/24) | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB586ER) |
2024-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (52-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (52-Y 46-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 24101960D-E |
2024-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB586E |
2024-02-07 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-01-26 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101960D |