VA HB603 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Nonresident concealed handgun permits; fee. Increases from $100 to $150 the maximum fee that can be charged by the Department of State Police for issuing a nonresident concealed handgun permit.
Title
Concealed handgun permits, nonresident; fee.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103487D |