VA HB610 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Rights of ingress and egress; use of former rail spur track easement; continuation or reinstatement of rights and benefits. Provides that where a right of ingress and egress for the use of a rail spur track is created on and over a servient estate for access to loading docks on a dominant estate, such rights and benefits associated with such dominant estate shall continue, or be reinstated, as necessary, if such rail spur track is abandoned or its use is discontinued.
Title
Rights of ingress and egress; use of former rail spur track easement, continuation or reinstatement.
Sponsors
Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101728D |