VA HB611 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civilian deaths in custody; report. Requires every law-enforcement agency and state or juvenile correctional facility to report to the Department of Criminal Justice Services and every local or regional adult correctional facility to report to the State Board of Local and Regional Jails certain information regarding the death of any person who is detained, under arrest or in the process of being arrested, en route to be incarcerated, incarcerated, or otherwise in the custody of such law-enforcement agency or correctional facility. The bill provides that any law-enforcement agency or state or juvenile correctional facility that fails to comply may, at the discretion of the Department, be declared ineligible for state grants or funds. The bill also requires the Department and the Board to analyze the submitted data to determine the means by which such information can be used to reduce the number of such deaths. The bill requires the Director of the Department and the Board to each annually report the findings and recommendations resulting from the analysis and interpretation of the data to the Governor, the General Assembly, and the Attorney General beginning on or before July 1, 2025, and each July 1 thereafter. The bill also provides that upon request, the Board shall provide the submitted data to the Department to meet federal reporting requirements.
Title
Civilian deaths in custody; report.
Sponsors
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Holly Seibold [D] | Del. Elizabeth Bennett-Parker [D] |
Del. Rae Cousins [D] | Del. Jackie Glass [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0813) | |
2024-04-17 | House | Enacted, Chapter 813 (effective 7/1/24) |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB611ER2) |
2024-04-17 | House | Reenrolled |
2024-04-17 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | VOTE: Adoption (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-17 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N) |
2024-04-08 | House | Governor's substitute printed 24109250D-H2 |
2024-04-08 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2024-03-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 27, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB611ER) |
2024-03-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-03-06 | House | VOTE: Adoption (94-Y 4-N) |
2024-03-06 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 24108674D-S1 (94-Y 4-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB611S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 24108674D-S1 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 24108674D-S1 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-13 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-13 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 5-N) |
2024-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB611H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 24106839D-H1 |
2024-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2024-02-09 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-07 | House | Reported from Appropriations (13-Y 9-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2024-02-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-02 | House | Incorporates HB423 (McQuinn) |
2024-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 24106839D-H1 |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Public Safety with substitute (20-Y 2-N) |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2024-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (4-Y 2-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned PS sub: Public Safety |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24100870D |
Same As/Similar To
HB423 (Similar To) 2024-02-02 - Incorporated by Public Safety
Subjects
Arrest
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Commonwealth Public Safety
Correctional Enterprises
Criminal Justice Services
Police
Study Commissions Committees and Reports
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Commonwealth Public Safety
Correctional Enterprises
Criminal Justice Services
Police
Study Commissions Committees and Reports