VA HB619 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-15 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; interdiction; possession or consumption of alcoholic beverages by interdicted persons; repeal. Repeals provisions allowing for a court to enter an order of interdiction prohibiting the sale of alcoholic beverages to any person who has (i) been convicted of driving any automobile, truck, motorcycle, engine, or train while intoxicated; (ii) shown himself to be a habitual drunkard; (iii) been found guilty of the illegal manufacture, possession, transportation, or sale of alcoholic beverages; or (iv) been found guilty of maintaining a common nuisance. The bill also repeals the provisions making it a Class 1 misdemeanor for (a) any person to sell alcoholic beverages to any individual when at the time of such sale he knows or has reason to believe that the individual to whom the sale is made is interdicted, (b) any person to purchase alcoholic beverages for another person when at the time of such purchase he knows or has reason to believe that the person for whom the alcoholic beverage is purchased is interdicted, or (c) any person who has been interdicted to possess any alcoholic beverages or be drunk in public. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; possession or consumption of alcoholic beverages by interdicted persons.
Sponsors
Sen. Jennifer Carroll Foy [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2018-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 2-N) |
2018-02-01 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-23 | House | Referred from General Laws by voice vote |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104133D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 227 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 333 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 334 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |