VA HB63 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0067)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0067)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Court of Appeals; use of moot courtroom of accredited law schools. Provides that upon proper agreement with the applicable authorities the Court of Appeals may use the moot courtroom of any accredited law school located in the Commonwealth for the holding of court and for its ancillary functions. Current law specifies that the Court may use state and federal facilities but not private law schools in the Commonwealth.
Title
Court of Appeals; use of moot courtroom of accredited law schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0067) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 67 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB63ER) |
2020-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-31 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-27 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (20-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2019-12-04 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-12-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100871D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1002 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0197)