VA HB636 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Secretary of the Commonwealth; centralized filing of disclosure statements; establishment of searchable database. Centralizes the filing of economic interest disclosure statements in the Office of the Secretary of the Commonwealth. Currently only state officers and employees file such statements with the Secretary; local officers and employees file with the clerk of the locality, members of the Senate file with the Clerk of the Senate, and members of the House of Delegates file with the Clerk of the House. In addition, the bill requires the Secretary of the Commonwealth to establish and maintain a searchable electronic database comprising all disclosure statements and available to the public through the Internet. The bill also provides for civil penalties for late and incomplete disclosure filings to be assessed and collected by the Secretary.
Title
Commonwealth, Secretary of the; centralized filing of disclosure statements, establish database.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2014-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-21 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Ethics |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-17 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103360D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 3114.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 417.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 417.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 417.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB636 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB636+hil |